Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Protective Orders - Relief Eligibility - Rape and Sexual Offenses
Sponsored by
Senators Waldstreicher, West, Carter, Lee, Sydnor, and Young
Status
In the Senate - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Removing rape and certain sexual offenses from the list of offenses alleged to have been committed by a certain respondent against a certain victim for which a peace order petition may be filed under certain circumstances; and altering the definition of "person eligible for relief" for purposes of certain provisions of law relating to domestic violence protective orders to include an individual who alleges the commission, within 6 months of the filing of the petition, of certain acts against the individual by a certain respondent.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0248
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0209 Session: 2019 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/16/2020
Legislative Date
1/16/2020
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Protective Orders - Relief Eligibility - Rape and Sexual Offenses
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2020
Legislative Date
1/17/2020
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2020
Legislative Date
2/18/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2020
Legislative Date
2/19/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {398571/1
Proceedings
31
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2020
Legislative Date
2/19/2020
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Waldstreicher) Adopted
Proceedings
31
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2020
Legislative Date
2/20/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {398571/1
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2020
Legislative Date
2/20/2020
Action
Committee Amendment Adopted
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2020
Legislative Date
2/20/2020
Action
Motion Recommit to Committee (Senator Bailey) Rejected (16-30)
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2020
Legislative Date
2/20/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Adopted (27-19)
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2020
Legislative Date
2/20/2020
Action
Floor Amendment {923926/1 (Senator Ready)
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2020
Legislative Date
2/20/2020
Action
Motion Special Order until 2/21 (Senator Ready) Adopted
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2020
Legislative Date
2/21/2020
Action
Floor Amendment {923926/1 (Senator Ready) Withdrawn
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2020
Legislative Date
2/21/2020
Action
Substitute Floor Amendment {343424/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (17-27)
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2020
Legislative Date
2/21/2020
Action
Floor Amendment {603227/1 (Senator Hough) Rejected (16-28)
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2020
Legislative Date
2/21/2020
Action
Floor Amendment {263226/1 (Senator Simonaire) Rejected
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2020
Legislative Date
2/21/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Protective Orders - Relief Eligibility - Rape and Sexual Offenses
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Motion Returned Second Reading (Senator Simonaire) Adopted
Proceedings
35
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Floor Amendment {843322/1 (Senator Simonaire) Rejected (16-31)
Proceedings
35
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
35
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/16/2020 1/16/2020 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Protective Orders - Relief Eligibility - Rape and Sexual Offenses
Senate 1/17/2020 1/17/2020 Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/18/2020 2/18/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/19/2020 2/19/2020 Favorable with Amendments {398571/1 31
Senate 2/19/2020 2/19/2020 Motion Laid Over (Senator Waldstreicher) Adopted 31
Senate 2/20/2020 2/20/2020 Favorable with Amendments {398571/1 32
Senate 2/20/2020 2/20/2020 Committee Amendment Adopted 32
Senate 2/20/2020 2/20/2020 Motion Recommit to Committee (Senator Bailey) Rejected (16-30) 32
Senate 2/20/2020 2/20/2020 Favorable with Amendments Adopted (27-19) 32
Senate 2/20/2020 2/20/2020 Floor Amendment {923926/1 (Senator Ready) 32
Senate 2/20/2020 2/20/2020 Motion Special Order until 2/21 (Senator Ready) Adopted 32
Senate 2/21/2020 2/21/2020 Floor Amendment {923926/1 (Senator Ready) Withdrawn 33
Senate 2/21/2020 2/21/2020 Substitute Floor Amendment {343424/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (17-27) 33
Senate 2/21/2020 2/21/2020 Floor Amendment {603227/1 (Senator Hough) Rejected (16-28) 33
Senate 2/21/2020 2/21/2020 Floor Amendment {263226/1 (Senator Simonaire) Rejected 33
Senate 2/21/2020 2/21/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 33
Text - Third - Protective Orders - Relief Eligibility - Rape and Sexual Offenses
Senate 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Motion Returned Second Reading (Senator Simonaire) Adopted 35
Senate 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Floor Amendment {843322/1 (Senator Simonaire) Rejected (16-31) 35
Senate 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 35
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/25/2020 10:52 AM