Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Correctional Services - Murder - Diminution Credits
Sponsored by
Senators Waugh, Hough, Norman, Ready, and Serafini
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 3:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting the earning of diminution credits to reduce the term of confinement of an inmate who is serving a sentence for murder in the first degree or murder in the second degree in a State or local correctional facility; and providing for the prospective application of the Act.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0579
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0447 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/18/2018
Legislative Date
1/18/2018
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/18/2018
Legislative Date
1/18/2018
Action
Hearing 2/01 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Correctional Services - Murder - Diminution Credits
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2018
Legislative Date
2/20/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2018
Legislative Date
2/20/2018
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/18/2018 1/18/2018 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/18/2018 1/18/2018 Hearing 2/01 at 2:00 p.m.
Text - First - Correctional Services - Murder - Diminution Credits
Senate 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/20/2018 2/20/2018 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/20/2018 2/20/2018 Hearing 2/28 at 3:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-502, 3-702 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM