Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Law Enforcement - Federal Military Surplus Program - Equipment Acquisition
Sponsored by
Senator Lee
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 321
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring that, on or before February 1 each year, the Department of State Police submit a report on the acquisition of equipment by law enforcement agencies through federal surplus programs within the preceding calendar year to the Governor and the General Assembly; requiring the Department to include in a prominent location on its public website a link to the Defense Logistics Agency's report listing excess Department of Defense property transfers to law enforcement agencies; and terminating the Act after September 30, 2022.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0138
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0661 Session: 2018 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2019
Legislative Date
1/24/2019
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2019
Legislative Date
1/25/2019
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {318979/1
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/14 (Senator Jennings) Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {318979/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2019
Legislative Date
3/19/2019
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
4/03/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-1)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/30/2019
Legislative Date
4/30/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 321
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/24/2019 1/24/2019 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Law Enforcement - Federal Military Surplus Program - Equipment Acquisition
Senate 1/25/2019 1/25/2019 Hearing 2/05 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 Favorable with Amendments {318979/1 44
Senate 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 Motion Special Order until 3/14 (Senator Jennings) Adopted 44
Senate 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Favorable with Amendments {318979/1 Adopted 46
Senate 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46
Text - Third - Law Enforcement - Federal Military Surplus Program - Equipment Acquisition
Senate 3/18/2019 3/16/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 48
House 3/19/2019 3/15/2019 Referred Judiciary 50
House 3/19/2019 3/19/2019 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 4/03/2019 4/03/2019 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 4/03/2019 3/24/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 59
House 4/04/2019 3/27/2019 Third Reading Passed (133-1) 62
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 4/30/2019 4/30/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 321
Text - Chapter - Law Enforcement - Federal Military Surplus Program - Equipment Acquisition
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM