Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Cecil County - Orphans' Court Judges - Travel Expense Allowance
Sponsored by
Cecil County Senators
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 78
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing the allowance for traveling expenses for the judges of the Orphans' Court for Cecil County from $780 to $1,500; and specifying that the allowance is to be paid by the county.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0629
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/19/2017
Legislative Date
1/19/2017
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/19/2017
Legislative Date
1/19/2017
Action
Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Cecil County - Orphans' Court Judges - Travel Expense Allowance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2017
Legislative Date
2/06/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
19
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Cecil County - Orphans' Court Judges - Travel Expense Allowance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2017
Legislative Date
2/13/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
22
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2017
Legislative Date
2/14/2017
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
25
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/21/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2017
Legislative Date
3/25/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/11/2017
Legislative Date
4/11/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 78
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Cecil County - Orphans' Court Judges - Travel Expense Allowance
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/19/2017 1/19/2017 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/19/2017 1/19/2017 Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Cecil County - Orphans' Court Judges - Travel Expense Allowance
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/06/2017 2/06/2017 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 19
Text - Third - Cecil County - Orphans' Court Judges - Travel Expense Allowance
Senate 2/13/2017 2/13/2017 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 22
House 2/14/2017 2/14/2017 Referred Health and Government Operations 25
House 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/24/2017 3/24/2017 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/24/2017 3/21/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 55
House 3/28/2017 3/23/2017 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 57
Senate 3/29/2017 3/25/2017 Returned Passed 54
Post Passage 4/11/2017 4/11/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 78
Text - Chapter - Cecil County - Orphans' Court Judges - Travel Expense Allowance
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM