Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Allegany County - Property Tax Credit - Cumberland Economic Development Corporation
Sponsored by
Senator Edwards
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 118
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the governing body of Allegany County and of a municipal corporation in Allegany County to grant, by law, a property tax credit against the county or municipal corporation property tax imposed on property owned by the Cumberland Economic Development Corporation; and applying the Act to taxable years beginning after June 30, 2019.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0243
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2019
Legislative Date
1/24/2019
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2019
Legislative Date
1/25/2019
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2019
Legislative Date
2/07/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
22
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
22
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2019
Legislative Date
2/12/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
24
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2019
Legislative Date
2/13/2019
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
26
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2019
Legislative Date
4/18/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 118
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/24/2019 1/24/2019 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Allegany County - Property Tax Credit - Cumberland Economic Development Corporation
Senate 1/25/2019 1/25/2019 Hearing 2/05 at 2:30 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/07/2019 2/07/2019 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 Favorable Adopted 22
Senate 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 Second Reading Passed 22
Text - Third - Allegany County - Property Tax Credit - Cumberland Economic Development Corporation
Senate 2/12/2019 2/12/2019 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 24
House 2/13/2019 2/13/2019 Referred Ways and Means 26
House 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 4/01/2019 4/01/2019 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 4/02/2019 3/23/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 58
House 4/04/2019 3/26/2019 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 61
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 4/18/2019 4/18/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 118
Text - Chapter - Allegany County - Property Tax Credit - Cumberland Economic Development Corporation
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM