Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Motor Vehicle Registration - Exception for Golf Carts - Town of Vienna
Sponsored by
Senator Eckardt
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 175
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Creating an exception from motor vehicle registration requirements for golf carts in the Town of Vienna; providing that a person who operates a golf cart on a highway in the Town of Vienna may operate the golf cart only on certain roads at certain times and only if the golf cart is equipped with certain lighting devices; requiring a person who operates a golf cart in the Town of Vienna to possess a valid driver's license; authorizing the town government to designate the highways on which a person may operate a golf cart in the Town of Vienna; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0330
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/18/2018
Legislative Date
1/18/2018
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Motor Vehicle Registration - Exception for Golf Carts - Town of Vienna
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2018
Legislative Date
1/22/2018
Action
Reassigned to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
9
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2018
Legislative Date
1/24/2018
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2018
Legislative Date
2/14/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
26
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2018
Legislative Date
2/14/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
26
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Motor Vehicle Registration - Exception for Golf Carts - Town of Vienna
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2018
Legislative Date
2/19/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
29
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2018
Legislative Date
2/20/2018
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
30
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/25/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {910613/1 Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/25/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/24/2018
Legislative Date
4/24/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 175
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/18/2018 1/18/2018 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Motor Vehicle Registration - Exception for Golf Carts - Town of Vienna
Senate 1/22/2018 1/22/2018 Reassigned to Judicial Proceedings 9
Senate 1/24/2018 1/24/2018 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/14/2018 2/14/2018 Favorable Adopted 26
Senate 2/14/2018 2/14/2018 Second Reading Passed 26
Text - Third - Motor Vehicle Registration - Exception for Golf Carts - Town of Vienna
Senate 2/19/2018 2/19/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 29
House 2/20/2018 2/20/2018 Referred Environment and Transportation 30
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 4/02/2018 4/02/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/03/2018 3/25/2018 Favorable with Amendments {910613/1 Adopted 59
House 4/03/2018 3/25/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59
House 4/06/2018 3/29/2018 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 63
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Senate Concurs House Amendments 66
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 66
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Motor Vehicle Registration - Exception for Golf Carts - Town of Vienna
Post Passage 4/24/2018 4/24/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 175
Text - Chapter - Motor Vehicle Registration - Exception for Golf Carts - Town of Vienna
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-402, 21-104.3, 21-104.4 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM