Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Boat Act - Abandoned or Sunken Vessels - Removal
Sponsored by
Senators Elfreth, Bailey, Beidle, Eckardt, Guzzone, Hershey, Jennings, Miller, Ready, Reilly, Salling, and Simonaire
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 76
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the definition of an "abandoned or sunken vessel" to mean one that has remained at a location for more than 60 instead of 90 days without the consent of the property owner; requiring the Department of Natural Resources to take an abandoned vessel into custody without providing a certain notice if it determines that the vessel poses certain hazards; requiring, within 15 days after taking custody of an abandoned vessel, the Department to send a certain notice to the last known owner and each know secured party of the vessel; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0143
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2020
Legislative Date
1/17/2020
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2020
Legislative Date
1/17/2020
Action
Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Boat Act - Abandoned or Sunken Vessels - Removal
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2020
Legislative Date
2/11/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {694438/1 Adopted
Proceedings
25
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2020
Legislative Date
2/11/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
25
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - State Boat Act - Abandoned or Sunken Vessels - Removal
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2020
Legislative Date
2/13/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
27
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2020
Legislative Date
2/14/2020
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
28
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/17/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {740918/1 Adopted
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted (131-0)
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - State Boat Act - Abandoned or Sunken Vessels - Removal
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 76
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - State Boat Act - Abandoned or Sunken Vessels - Removal
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/17/2020 1/17/2020 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/17/2020 1/17/2020 Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - State Boat Act - Abandoned or Sunken Vessels - Removal
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/11/2020 2/11/2020 Favorable with Amendments {694438/1 Adopted 25
Senate 2/11/2020 2/11/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 25
Text - Third - State Boat Act - Abandoned or Sunken Vessels - Removal
Senate 2/13/2020 2/13/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 27
House 2/14/2020 2/14/2020 Referred Environment and Transportation 28
House 3/11/2020 3/11/2020 Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/17/2020 3/17/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/17/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable with Amendments {740918/1 Adopted 51A
House 3/17/2020 3/14/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 51A
House 3/17/2020 3/14/2020 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted (131-0) 51A
House 3/17/2020 3/14/2020 Third Reading Passed (132-0) 51A
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Senate Concurs House Amendments 53
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 53
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - State Boat Act - Abandoned or Sunken Vessels - Removal
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 76
Text - Chapter - State Boat Act - Abandoned or Sunken Vessels - Removal
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:55 PM