Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Anne Arundel County Board of Education – Annual Meeting and Election of Officers
Sponsored by
Senators Beidle, Elfreth, Reilly, Rosapepe, and Simonaire
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 540
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Anne Arundel County Board of Education to elect a president and vice president from among its elected members at its annual meeting; establishing a term of 1 year for the president and vice president; providing that an individual who fills a certain vacancy may be elected to serve as president or vice president; and altering the date on which the county board is required to hold its annual meeting from on or as near as possible to the second Tuesday in July to on or as near as possible to the first Wednesday in December.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0287
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Motion Recede (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted (131-0)
Proceedings
52A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2020
Legislative Date
1/17/2020
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Anne Arundel County Board of Education - Annual Meeting - Date
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2020
Legislative Date
1/23/2020
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2020
Legislative Date
2/11/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {994837/1 Adopted
Proceedings
25
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2020
Legislative Date
2/11/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
25
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2020
Legislative Date
2/13/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
27
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2020
Legislative Date
2/14/2020
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
28
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {875961/1 Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Floor Amendment {823623/1 (Delegate Washington) Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (133-0)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments
Proceedings
52A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
52A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments
Proceedings
52A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
52A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
House Recede
Proceedings
52A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53C
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 540
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Motion Recede (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted (131-0) 52A
Senate 1/17/2020 1/17/2020 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Anne Arundel County Board of Education - Annual Meeting - Date
Senate 1/23/2020 1/23/2020 Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/11/2020 2/11/2020 Favorable with Amendments {994837/1 Adopted 25
Senate 2/11/2020 2/11/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 25
Text - Third - Anne Arundel County Board of Education – Annual Meeting and Election of Officers
Senate 2/13/2020 2/13/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 27
House 2/14/2020 2/14/2020 Referred Ways and Means 28
House 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/14/2020 3/14/2020 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/15/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable with Amendments {875961/1 Adopted 49
House 3/15/2020 3/12/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 49
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Floor Amendment {823623/1 (Delegate Washington) Adopted 50
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (133-0) 50
Senate 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments 52A
Senate 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Senate Requests House Recede 52A
House 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments 52A
House 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Senate Requests House Recede 52A
House 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 House Recede 52A
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Returned Passed 53C
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 540
Text - Chapter - Anne Arundel County Board of Education – Annual Meeting and Election of Officers
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-2A-06.1, 4-107   )
Last Updated: 7/9/2020 1:17 PM