Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Foreclosed Property Registry - Updated Information - Notice to Local Governments
Sponsored by
Senator Kelley
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 349
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation to establish procedures that require a foreclosure purchaser to submit to the Foreclosed Property Registry any change to certain information within 21 business days after the change is known to the purchaser; and requiring the Department to notify, by electronic means, on receipt of an initial registration or any change to certain information, authorized users from the county and the municipal corporation in which the property is located.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0078
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/18/2018
Legislative Date
1/18/2018
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/18/2018
Legislative Date
1/18/2018
Action
Hearing 1/31 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2018
Legislative Date
2/14/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
26
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2018
Legislative Date
2/14/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
26
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2018
Legislative Date
2/16/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
28
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2018
Legislative Date
2/19/2018
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
29
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/25/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {800810/1 Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/25/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Holmes) Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/25/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/24/2018
Legislative Date
4/24/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 349
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/18/2018 1/18/2018 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/18/2018 1/18/2018 Hearing 1/31 at 2:00 p.m.
Text - First - Foreclosed Property Registry - Updated Information - Notice to Local Governments
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/14/2018 2/14/2018 Favorable Adopted 26
Senate 2/14/2018 2/14/2018 Second Reading Passed 26
Text - Third - Foreclosed Property Registry - Updated Information - Notice to Local Governments
Senate 2/16/2018 2/16/2018 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 28
House 2/19/2018 2/19/2018 Referred Environment and Transportation 29
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 4/02/2018 4/02/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/03/2018 3/25/2018 Favorable with Amendments {800810/1 Adopted 59
House 4/03/2018 3/25/2018 Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Holmes) Adopted 59
House 4/03/2018 3/25/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59
House 4/06/2018 3/29/2018 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 63
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Senate Concurs House Amendments 66
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 66
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Foreclosed Property Registry - Updated Information - Notice to Local Governments
Post Passage 4/24/2018 4/24/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 349
Text - Chapter - Foreclosed Property Registry - Updated Information - Notice to Local Governments
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-126.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM