Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Professional Engineers - Engineering Documents Prepared at the Request of the State or Political Subdivision of the State - Signing and Sealing
Sponsored by
Senators Simonaire, Salling, and Waugh
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 361
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring specified engineering documents prepared at the request of the State or a political subdivision of the State, where specified skills are required, to be signed, sealed, and dated by a certain professional engineer who prepared or approved the documents.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2016
Legislative Date
1/21/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2016
Legislative Date
1/21/2016
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2016
Legislative Date
2/25/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2016
Legislative Date
2/26/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2016
Legislative Date
2/26/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/01/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
34
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2016
Legislative Date
3/02/2016
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2016
Legislative Date
3/09/2016
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/10/2016
Legislative Date
5/10/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 361
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/20/2016 1/21/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/21/2016 1/21/2016 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/24/2016 2/25/2016 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/26/2016 2/26/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 32
Senate 2/26/2016 2/26/2016 Second Reading Passed 32
Senate 3/01/2016 3/01/2016 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 34
House 3/02/2016 3/02/2016 First Reading Economic Matters 36
House 3/09/2016 3/09/2016 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/07/2016 4/08/2016 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 65
House 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Second Reading Passed 65
House 4/09/2016 4/04/2016 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 67
Senate 4/11/2016 4/03/2016 Returned Passed 63A
Post Passage 5/10/2016 5/10/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 361
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM