Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Insurance - Principle-Based Reserves
Sponsored by
Senator Kelley
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 245
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the exemptions that the Maryland Insurance Commissioner may provide to certain domestic insurance companies from certain reserve requirements; authorizing the Commissioner to exempt a certain domestic insurance company from certain requirements if the company meets the life principle-based reserve exemption criteria in the valuation manual; and repealing certain exemptions to certain reserve requirements.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Economic Matters
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0608
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2019
Legislative Date
1/24/2019
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Insurance - Principle-Based Reserves
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2019
Legislative Date
1/28/2019
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2019
Legislative Date
2/19/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2019
Legislative Date
2/20/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {337176/1 Adopted
Proceedings
30
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2019
Legislative Date
2/20/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
30
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Insurance - Principle-Based Reserves
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2019
Legislative Date
2/22/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
32
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2019
Legislative Date
2/25/2019
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/08/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/03/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/30/2019
Legislative Date
4/30/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 245
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Insurance - Principle-Based Reserves
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/24/2019 1/24/2019 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Insurance - Principle-Based Reserves
Senate 1/28/2019 1/28/2019 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 2/19/2019 2/19/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 2/20/2019 2/20/2019 Favorable with Amendments {337176/1 Adopted 30
Senate 2/20/2019 2/20/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 30
Text - Third - Insurance - Principle-Based Reserves
Senate 2/22/2019 2/22/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 32
House 2/25/2019 2/25/2019 Referred Economic Matters 34
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 4/08/2019 4/08/2019 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 67
House 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 68
Senate 4/08/2019 4/03/2019 Returned Passed 66
Post Passage 4/30/2019 4/30/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 245
Text - Chapter - Insurance - Principle-Based Reserves
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-317 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM