Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Sex Offenders
Sponsored by
Senators Ready, Bailey, Carozza, Hester, Hough, Salling, Zirkin, Smith, Carter, Cassilly, Lee, Waldstreicher, Washington, and West
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 389
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a District Court commissioner from authorizing the pretrial release of a defendant who is registered or required to register as a certain sex offender under certain circumstances.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2019
Legislative Date
1/24/2019
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Sex Offenders
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2019
Legislative Date
1/25/2019
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2019
Legislative Date
2/15/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2019
Legislative Date
2/18/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {988779/1 Adopted
Proceedings
28
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2019
Legislative Date
2/18/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
28
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Sex Offenders
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2019
Legislative Date
2/20/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2019
Legislative Date
2/21/2019
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
32
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
4/05/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {152115/1 Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Ready, Carter and Lee)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Ready, Carter and Lee)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
House Refuses Recede
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates J. Lewis, Grammer and Crutchfield)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
House Refuses Recede
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates J. Lewis, Grammer and Crutchfield)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/03/2019
Action
Conference Committee Report {893623/1 Adopted
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/03/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Conference Committee Report {893623/1 Adopted
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/03/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Sex Offenders
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/13/2019
Legislative Date
5/13/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 389
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Sex Offenders
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/24/2019 1/24/2019 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Sex Offenders
Senate 1/25/2019 1/25/2019 Hearing 2/07 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/15/2019 2/15/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/18/2019 2/18/2019 Favorable with Amendments {988779/1 Adopted 28
Senate 2/18/2019 2/18/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 28
Text - Third - Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Sex Offenders
Senate 2/20/2019 2/20/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 30
House 2/21/2019 2/21/2019 Referred Judiciary 32
House 3/13/2019 3/13/2019 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 4/05/2019 4/05/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 4/06/2019 3/30/2019 Favorable with Amendments {152115/1 Adopted 65
House 4/06/2019 3/30/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 65
House 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 66
Senate 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments 64
Senate 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Senate Requests House Recede 64
Senate 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Ready, Carter and Lee) 64
House 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments 68
House 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Senate Requests House Recede 68
House 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Ready, Carter and Lee) 68
House 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 House Refuses Recede 68
House 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates J. Lewis, Grammer and Crutchfield) 68
Senate 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 House Refuses Recede 65
Senate 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates J. Lewis, Grammer and Crutchfield) 65
Senate 4/08/2019 4/03/2019 Conference Committee Report {893623/1 Adopted 66
Senate 4/08/2019 4/03/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 66
House 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Conference Committee Report {893623/1 Adopted 68
House 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 68
Senate 4/08/2019 4/03/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Sex Offenders
Post Passage 5/13/2019 5/13/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 389
Text - Chapter - Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Sex Offenders
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM