Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Law - Canvassing of Absentee Ballots - Reporting Unofficial Results
Sponsored by
Senator Hough
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 42
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring local boards of elections to prepare and release a report of the unofficial results of the absentee ballot vote tabulation at the end of each day of absentee ballot canvassing.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2019
Legislative Date
1/25/2019
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2019
Legislative Date
1/31/2019
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2019
Legislative Date
2/21/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2019
Legislative Date
2/22/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2019
Legislative Date
2/22/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2019
Legislative Date
2/26/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
34
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2019
Legislative Date
2/27/2019
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
4/03/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until 04/06 (Delegate Atterbeary) Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-2)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2019
Legislative Date
4/18/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 42
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/25/2019 1/25/2019 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Election Law - Canvassing of Absentee Ballots - Reporting Unofficial Results
Senate 1/31/2019 1/31/2019 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/21/2019 2/21/2019 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/22/2019 2/22/2019 Favorable Adopted 32
Senate 2/22/2019 2/22/2019 Second Reading Passed 32
Text - Third - Election Law - Canvassing of Absentee Ballots - Reporting Unofficial Results
Senate 2/26/2019 2/26/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 34
House 2/27/2019 2/27/2019 Referred Ways and Means 36
House 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 4/03/2019 4/03/2019 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 4/03/2019 3/24/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 59
House 4/05/2019 3/29/2019 Motion Special Order until 04/06 (Delegate Atterbeary) Adopted 64
House 4/06/2019 3/30/2019 Third Reading Passed (137-2) 65
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Returned Passed 63
Post Passage 4/18/2019 4/18/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 42
Text - Chapter - Election Law - Canvassing of Absentee Ballots - Reporting Unofficial Results
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-302 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM