Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Sexual Solicitation of a Minor - Solicitation Through Parent, Guardian, or Custodian - Prohibition and Penalties
Sponsored by
Senators Lee, Beidle, Benson, Carozza, Cassilly, Griffith, Guzzone, Kagan, King, Klausmeier, Kramer, Lam, McCray, Ready, Sydnor, West, Young, and Zucker
Status
In the House - First Reading Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from knowingly and with a certain intent soliciting the consent of a parent, guardian, or custodian of a minor, or a law enforcement officer posing as a parent, guardian, or custodian of a minor, to engage in certain prohibited sexual acts with the minor; and establishing and altering certain penalties.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0246
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2020
Legislative Date
1/17/2020
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2020
Legislative Date
1/17/2020
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2020
Legislative Date
2/11/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {778574/1 Adopted
Proceedings
25
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2020
Legislative Date
2/11/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
25
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2020
Legislative Date
2/13/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
27
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2020
Legislative Date
2/14/2020
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
28
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/17/2020 1/17/2020 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/17/2020 1/17/2020 Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Sexual Solicitation of a Minor - Solicitation Through Parent, Guardian, or Custodian - Prohibition and Penalties
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/11/2020 2/11/2020 Favorable with Amendments {778574/1 Adopted 25
Senate 2/11/2020 2/11/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 25
Text - Third - Sexual Solicitation of a Minor - Solicitation Through Parent, Guardian, or Custodian - Prohibition and Penalties
Senate 2/13/2020 2/13/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 27
House 2/14/2020 2/14/2020 Referred Judiciary 28
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/21/2020 1:03 PM