Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Commission on Civil Rights - Employment Discrimination - Reporting
Sponsored by
Senator Hettleman
Status
In the House - First Reading Health and Government Operations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Commission on Civil Rights to include a review of certain data and recommendations, if any, for policy changes to address discriminatory trends noted in the data in its annual report; requiring certain county offices of civil rights, or other appropriate agencies, to report certain information relating to complaints of employment discrimination to the Commission; making the reporting requirement applicable only in certain counties; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0257
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0703 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/06/2020
Legislative Date
9/06/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/28/2020
Legislative Date
12/28/2020
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/09/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/09/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {798374/1 Adopted
Proceedings
9 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/09/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
9 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
10 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
10 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 9/06/2020 9/06/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 12/28/2020 12/28/2020 Hearing 1/28 at 11:00 a.m.
Text - First - Maryland Commission on Civil Rights - Employment Discrimination - Reporting
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/09/2021 2/09/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2021 2/09/2021 Favorable with Amendments {798374/1 Adopted 9 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/09/2021 2/09/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 9 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Commission on Civil Rights - Employment Discrimination - Reporting
Senate 2/10/2021 2/10/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 10 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/11/2021 2/11/2021 Referred Health and Government Operations 10 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 2/22/2021 2:37 PM
Click to return on the top page