Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Insurance Commissioner - Responsibility for Holding Hearings - Delegation
Sponsored by
Senator Kelley
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 56
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the authority of the Maryland Insurance Commissioner to delegate to the Deputy Commissioner, an associate commissioner, or one other Administration employee who is designated by the Commissioner and admitted to the practice of law in the State the responsibility for holding a hearing under specified provisions of law.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Economic Matters  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2016
Legislative Date
1/22/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2016
Legislative Date
1/22/2016
Action
Hearing 2/03 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/11/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {537578/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
22
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
22
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2016
Legislative Date
2/16/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
24
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/17/2016
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
26
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2016
Legislative Date
2/24/2016
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/12/2016
Legislative Date
4/12/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 56
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/21/2016 1/22/2016 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/22/2016 1/22/2016 Hearing 2/03 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 2/10/2016 2/11/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 2/12/2016 2/12/2016 Favorable with Amendments {537578/1 Report Adopted 22
Senate 2/12/2016 2/12/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 22
Senate 2/16/2016 2/16/2016 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 24
House 2/17/2016 2/17/2016 First Reading Economic Matters 26
House 2/24/2016 2/24/2016 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/06/2016 4/07/2016 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/07/2016 3/31/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 63
House 4/07/2016 3/31/2016 Second Reading Passed 63
House 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 64
Senate 4/12/2016 4/08/2016 Returned Passed 68
Post Passage 4/12/2016 4/12/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 56
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-210 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM