Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Incompetency and Criminal Responsibility - Dismissal of Charges
Sponsored by
Senators Lee, Feldman, West, and Hough
Status
In the House - Conference Committee Appointed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the time period after which a court is required, under certain circumstances, to dismiss a charge of murder in the first degree against a defendant found incompetent to stand trial from 5 years to 10 years.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0743
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2019
Legislative Date
1/25/2019
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2019
Legislative Date
1/25/2019
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {828573/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-1)
Proceedings
46AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
46AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
4/03/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {342412/1 Adopted
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments
Proceedings
62AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
62AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Lee, Hough and Waldstreicher)
Proceedings
62AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Lee, Hough and Waldstreicher)
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
House Refuses Recede
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Sydnor, Moon and Arikan)
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
House Refuses Recede
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Sydnor, Moon and Arikan)
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/25/2019 1/25/2019 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Incompetency and Criminal Responsibility - Dismissal of Charges
Senate 1/25/2019 1/25/2019 Hearing 2/12 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 Favorable with Amendments {828573/1 Adopted 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Criminal Procedure - Incompetency and Criminal Responsibility - Dismissal of Charges
Senate 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-1) 46AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2019 3/11/2019 Referred Judiciary 46AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2019 4/03/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 4/03/2019 3/24/2019 Favorable with Amendments {342412/1 Adopted 59 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2019 3/24/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2019 3/25/2019 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments 62AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Senate Requests House Recede 62AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Lee, Hough and Waldstreicher) 62AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2019 3/30/2019 Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments 65 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2019 3/30/2019 Senate Requests House Recede 65 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2019 3/30/2019 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Lee, Hough and Waldstreicher) 65 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2019 3/30/2019 House Refuses Recede 65 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2019 3/30/2019 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Sydnor, Moon and Arikan) 65 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 House Refuses Recede 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Sydnor, Moon and Arikan) 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM
Click to return on the top page