Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax Credit - Individuals Working in STEM Fields - Student Loan Payments
Sponsored by
Senators Kramer, Feldman, Lam, and Peters
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing a credit against the State income tax for certain individuals with outstanding student loan debt during the taxable year if the debt was incurred to attend an institution of higher education, a certain degree was obtained, and the individual is employed full-time by a Maryland-based employer in a certain field; authorizing certain individuals, on or before December 1 each year, to apply for the credit; providing the total amount of credits issued annually may not exceed $1,000,000; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0860 Session: 2018 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2019
Legislative Date
1/25/2019
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2019
Legislative Date
1/25/2019
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {679738/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/25/2019 1/25/2019 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/25/2019 1/25/2019 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Income Tax Credit - Individuals Working in STEM Fields - Student Loan Payments
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Favorable with Amendments {679738/1 Adopted 46
Senate 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46
Text - Third - Income Tax Credit - Individuals Working in STEM Fields - Student Loan Payments
Senate 3/18/2019 3/16/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 48
House 3/19/2019 3/15/2019 Referred Ways and Means 50
House 3/20/2019 3/20/2019 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-749 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM