Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Circuit Court Judges - Election
Sponsored by
Senator Kramer
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Proposing an amendment to the Maryland Constitution relating to the selection and tenure of circuit court judges; altering the method of filling vacancies in the office of a judge of a circuit court; providing for retention elections following an appointment to fill a vacancy in the office of a judge of a circuit court; providing for a transitional period under which the terms of certain amendments are to become effective; submitting the amendment to the qualified voters of the State for their adoption or rejection; etc.
Details
Constitutional Bill
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0724 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Contingency - on a referendum
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2019
Legislative Date
1/25/2019
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Circuit Court Judges - Election
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2019
Legislative Date
1/25/2019
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2019
Legislative Date
1/29/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2019
Legislative Date
1/30/2019
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/04/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/25/2019 1/25/2019 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Circuit Court Judges - Election
Senate 1/25/2019 1/25/2019 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/29/2019 1/29/2019 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/30/2019 1/30/2019 Hearing 2/14 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM
Click to return on the top page