Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers, Distributors, and Factory Branches - Retaliation Against Dealers
Sponsored by
Senators Forehand and Raskin
Status
In the Senate - Third Reading Failed (20-25)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a manufacturer, distributor, or factory branch from retaliating against a specified vehicle dealer because of legislation enacted by the General Assembly that regulates the franchise relationship.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2013
Legislative Date
1/18/2013
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2013
Legislative Date
3/17/2013
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2013
Legislative Date
3/17/2013
Action
Special Order until 3/22 (Senator Raskin) Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Special Order until 3/25 (Senator Ramirez) Adopted
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
Special Order until 3/26 (Senator Klausmeier) Adopted
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2013
Legislative Date
3/22/2013
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2013
Legislative Date
3/22/2013
Action
Special Order until 3/27 (Senator Klausmeier) Adopted
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2013
Legislative Date
3/23/2013
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2013
Legislative Date
3/23/2013
Action
Special Order until 3/28 (Senator Klausmeier) Adopted (31-12)
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2013
Legislative Date
3/24/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2013
Legislative Date
3/24/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2013
Legislative Date
3/25/2013
Action
Special Order until later today (Senator Ramirez) Adopted
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2013
Legislative Date
3/25/2013
Action
Special Order until 4/1 (Senator DeGrange) Adopted
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Third Reading Failed (20-25)
Proceedings
58
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/21/2013 1/18/2013 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/23/2013 1/23/2013 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/15/2013 3/18/2013 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/19/2013 3/17/2013 Favorable 48
Senate 3/19/2013 3/17/2013 Special Order until 3/22 (Senator Raskin) Adopted 48
Senate 3/22/2013 3/20/2013 Favorable 51
Senate 3/22/2013 3/20/2013 Special Order until 3/25 (Senator Ramirez) Adopted 51
Senate 3/25/2013 3/21/2013 Favorable 52
Senate 3/25/2013 3/21/2013 Special Order until 3/26 (Senator Klausmeier) Adopted 52
Senate 3/26/2013 3/22/2013 Favorable 53
Senate 3/26/2013 3/22/2013 Special Order until 3/27 (Senator Klausmeier) Adopted 53
Senate 3/27/2013 3/23/2013 Favorable 54
Senate 3/27/2013 3/23/2013 Special Order until 3/28 (Senator Klausmeier) Adopted (31-12) 54
Senate 3/28/2013 3/24/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 55
Senate 3/28/2013 3/24/2013 Second Reading Passed 55
Senate 3/29/2013 3/25/2013 Special Order until later today (Senator Ramirez) Adopted 56
Senate 3/29/2013 3/25/2013 Special Order until 4/1 (Senator DeGrange) Adopted 56
Senate 4/01/2013 3/27/2013 Third Reading Failed (20-25) 58
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-201, 15-207.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM