Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Somerset County - Alcoholic Beverages - Micro-Brewery Licenses
Sponsored by
Senator Mathias
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 286
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Adding Somerset County to the list of jurisdictions in which a Class 7 micro-brewery license may be issued; and adding Somerset County to the list of jurisdictions in which the holder of a Class 7 micro-brewery license may sell at retail beer brewed under the license to customers for consumption off the licensed premises in specified refillable containers.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/16/2014
Legislative Date
1/17/2014
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/04/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/05/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/05/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/07/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/07/2014
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/23/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/23/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/23/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/05/2014
Legislative Date
5/05/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 286
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/16/2014 1/17/2014 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/29/2014 1/29/2014 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/31/2014 1/31/2014 Hearing cancelled
Senate 1/31/2014 1/31/2014 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/03/2014 3/04/2014 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/05/2014 3/05/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 39
Senate 3/05/2014 3/05/2014 Second Reading Passed 39
Senate 3/07/2014 3/07/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 41
House 3/07/2014 3/07/2014 First Reading Economic Matters 43
House 3/27/2014 3/28/2014 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/28/2014 3/23/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 59
House 3/28/2014 3/23/2014 Second Reading Passed 59
House 3/31/2014 3/24/2014 Third Reading Passed (132-0) 60
Senate 4/01/2014 3/23/2014 Returned Passed 57
Post Passage 5/05/2014 5/05/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 286
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM