Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health - Treatment for the Prevention of HIV - Consent by Minors
Sponsored by
Senators Lam, Feldman, Hayes, and Kelley
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 728
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing that a minor has the same capacity as an adult to consent to treatment for the prevention of human immunodeficiency virus (HIV).
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1183
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2019
Legislative Date
1/25/2019
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2019
Legislative Date
1/28/2019
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {917278/1
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Simonaire) Adopted
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {917278/1 Adopted
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
45A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2019
Legislative Date
3/17/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (111-19)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2019
Legislative Date
3/22/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2019
Legislative Date
5/25/2019
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 728
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/25/2019 1/25/2019 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Public Health - Treatment for the Prevention of HIV - Consent by Minors
Senate 1/28/2019 1/28/2019 Hearing 2/06 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Favorable with Amendments {917278/1 42
Senate 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Motion Laid Over (Senator Simonaire) Adopted 42
Senate 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Favorable with Amendments {917278/1 Adopted 43
Senate 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 43
Text - Third - Public Health - Treatment for the Prevention of HIV - Consent by Minors
Senate 3/13/2019 3/13/2019 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 45A
House 3/14/2019 3/11/2019 Referred Health and Government Operations 46
House 3/16/2019 3/16/2019 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/21/2019 3/21/2019 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/22/2019 3/17/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 52
House 3/25/2019 3/18/2019 Third Reading Passed (111-19) 53
Senate 3/26/2019 3/22/2019 Returned Passed 54
Post Passage 5/25/2019 5/25/2019 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 728
Text - Chapter - Public Health - Treatment for the Prevention of HIV - Consent by Minors
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM