Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Law - Special Elections - Calendar Revisions
Sponsored by
Senator Pinsky
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 10
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the deadline by which a certificate of candidacy for an office to be filled by a special election is required to be filed; establishing the filing deadline for a certificate of candidacy for a special election of a write-in candidate; providing that a certain individual may not file a certificate of candidacy if there are 64 days or fewer before the date of the election; establishing a filing deadline for a certificate of nomination; providing that a certain judicial review be sought by a certain date; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Emergency Bill
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2020
Legislative Date
1/20/2020
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2020
Legislative Date
1/20/2020
Action
Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Election Law - Special Elections - Calendar Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2020
Legislative Date
1/23/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2020
Legislative Date
1/23/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {794437/1 Adopted
Proceedings
12
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2020
Legislative Date
1/23/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
12
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Election Law - Special Elections - Calendar Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2020
Legislative Date
1/24/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (40-0)
Proceedings
13
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2020
Legislative Date
1/27/2020
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
14
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2020
Legislative Date
1/28/2020
Action
Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2020
Legislative Date
1/30/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2020
Legislative Date
1/30/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
17
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2020
Legislative Date
1/30/2020
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted (131-0)
Proceedings
17
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2020
Legislative Date
1/30/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
17
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2020
Legislative Date
1/31/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
18
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 10
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Election Law - Special Elections - Calendar Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/20/2020 1/20/2020 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/20/2020 1/20/2020 Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Election Law - Special Elections - Calendar Revisions
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/23/2020 1/23/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/23/2020 1/23/2020 Favorable with Amendments {794437/1 Adopted 12
Senate 1/23/2020 1/23/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 12
Text - Third - Election Law - Special Elections - Calendar Revisions
Senate 1/24/2020 1/24/2020 Third Reading Passed (40-0) 13
House 1/27/2020 1/27/2020 Referred Ways and Means 14
House 1/28/2020 1/28/2020 Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 1/30/2020 1/30/2020 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 1/30/2020 1/30/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 17
House 1/30/2020 1/30/2020 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted (131-0) 17
House 1/30/2020 1/30/2020 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 17
Senate 1/31/2020 1/31/2020 Returned Passed 18
Post Passage 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 10
Text - Chapter - Election Law - Special Elections - Calendar Revisions
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-401, 5-303, 5-703.1, 6-210, 8-710, 8-711, 9-207 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:56 PM