Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Major Information Technology Development Project Fund – Money Received by Baltimore City Community College – Exemption
Sponsored by
Senators Hayes, Carter, Ferguson, McCray, and Washington
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 751
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Excluding from the Major Information Technology Development Project Fund certain money received by Baltimore City Community College; and providing for the prospective application of the Act.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2019
Legislative Date
1/25/2019
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2019
Legislative Date
1/29/2019
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {824537/1 Adopted
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2019
Legislative Date
3/10/2019
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {873726/1 (Delegate Kipke) Adopted
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/22/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Young, Patterson and Nathan-Pulliam)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Young, Patterson and Nathan-Pulliam)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
House Refuses Recede
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Carr, Szeliga and Rosenberg)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
House Refuses Recede
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Carr, Szeliga and Rosenberg)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Conference Committee Report {213023/1 Adopted
Proceedings
62A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (43-0)
Proceedings
62A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Conference Committee Report {213023/1
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Pendergrass) Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Conference Committee Report {213023/1 Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2019
Legislative Date
5/25/2019
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 751
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/25/2019 1/25/2019 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Major Information Technology Development Project Fund - Money Received by Baltimore City Community College - Exemption
Senate 1/29/2019 1/29/2019 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Favorable with Amendments {824537/1 Adopted 42
Senate 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 42
Text - Third - Major Information Technology Development Project Fund – Exemption and Use of Fund
Senate 3/13/2019 3/13/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 45
House 3/13/2019 3/10/2019 Referred Health and Government Operations 45
House 3/16/2019 3/16/2019 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/28/2019 3/28/2019 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/29/2019 3/21/2019 Favorable Adopted 56
House 3/29/2019 3/21/2019 Floor Amendment {873726/1 (Delegate Kipke) Adopted 56
House 3/29/2019 3/21/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 56
House 4/01/2019 3/22/2019 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 57
Senate 4/03/2019 3/28/2019 Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments 60
Senate 4/03/2019 3/28/2019 Senate Requests House Recede 60
Senate 4/03/2019 3/28/2019 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Young, Patterson and Nathan-Pulliam) 60
House 4/03/2019 3/25/2019 Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments 60
House 4/03/2019 3/25/2019 Senate Requests House Recede 60
House 4/03/2019 3/25/2019 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Young, Patterson and Nathan-Pulliam) 60
House 4/03/2019 3/25/2019 House Refuses Recede 60
House 4/03/2019 3/25/2019 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Carr, Szeliga and Rosenberg) 60
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 House Refuses Recede 62
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Carr, Szeliga and Rosenberg) 62
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Conference Committee Report {213023/1 Adopted 62A
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Third Reading Passed (43-0) 62A
House 4/05/2019 3/29/2019 Conference Committee Report {213023/1 64
House 4/05/2019 3/29/2019 Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Pendergrass) Adopted 64
House 4/05/2019 3/29/2019 Conference Committee Report {213023/1 Adopted 64
House 4/05/2019 3/29/2019 Third Reading Passed (132-0) 64
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Major Information Technology Development Project Fund – Money Received by Baltimore City Community College – Exemption
Post Passage 5/25/2019 5/25/2019 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 751
Text - Chapter - Major Information Technology Development Project Fund – Money Received by Baltimore City Community College – Exemption
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM