Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of General Services - Deep Creek Lake Buy Down Area Program - Extension
Sponsored by
Senator Edwards
Status
Veto sustained (0-46)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the Department of General Services to establish the Deep Creek Lake Buy Down Area Program to offer the owners of properties adjoining Deep Creek Lake the right to purchase the land contiguous to their land at an amount equal to the State's cost of acquiring the land plus reasonable costs and expenses incurred by the State from the sale; providing that revenue from the sale of specified property be distributed to the Deep Creek Lake Recreation Maintenance and Management Fund for specified land purchases; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0356
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/01/0001
Legislative Date
1/21/2016
Action
Veto sustained (0-46)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2015
Legislative Date
2/04/2015
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings and Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2015
Legislative Date
2/04/2015
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {218073/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/30/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/11/2015
Action
Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/13/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/08/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/08/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/09/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-1)
Proceedings
70
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/14/2015
Legislative Date
4/10/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2016
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/20/2016 (Senator Pugh) Adopted
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/01/0001 1/21/2016 Veto sustained (0-46)
Senate 2/03/2015 2/04/2015 First Reading Judicial Proceedings and Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/04/2015 2/04/2015 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Senate 4/02/2015 4/03/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/03/2015 3/29/2015 Favorable with Amendments {218073/1 Report Adopted 56
Senate 4/03/2015 3/29/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 56
Senate 4/06/2015 3/30/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 57
House 4/07/2015 4/01/2015 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 62
House 4/11/2015 4/11/2015 Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
House 4/13/2015 4/13/2015 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/13/2015 4/08/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 69
House 4/13/2015 4/08/2015 Second Reading Passed 69
House 4/13/2015 4/09/2015 Third Reading Passed (136-1) 70
Senate 4/14/2015 4/10/2015 Returned Passed 68
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Senate 1/13/2016 1/13/2016 Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/20/2016 (Senator Pugh) Adopted
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM