Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Perpetual Conservation Easements
Sponsored by
Senators Peters, Middleton, and Miller
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing a subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax for the first $250,000 in proceeds from the sale of a perpetual conservation easement on real property in the State.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1174
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0371 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2017
Legislative Date
1/20/2017
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2017
Legislative Date
1/27/2017
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2017
Legislative Date
2/27/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/03/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
39
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/20/2017 1/20/2017 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Perpetual Conservation Easements
Senate 1/27/2017 1/27/2017 Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/27/2017 2/27/2017 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/01/2017 3/01/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 34
Text - Third - Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Perpetual Conservation Easements
Senate 3/03/2017 3/03/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 36
House 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Referred Ways and Means 39
House 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-207 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM