Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Prince George's County - Property Tax Deferrals - Elderly and Disabled Homeowners
Sponsored by
Senators Currie, Benson, Peters, Ramirez, Rosapepe, and Muse
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 368
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring that, in Prince George's County, the interest payable on specified county property tax payment deferrals may not exceed 4%; requiring the governing body of Prince George's County to establish and promote a specified public awareness campaign related to specified property tax deferral programs; authorizing the governing body of Prince George's County to provide, by law, a specified payment deferral of the county property tax for specified residential real property; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1017
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0623 Session: 2015 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2016
Legislative Date
1/22/2016
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2016
Legislative Date
1/27/2016
Action
Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2016
Legislative Date
2/15/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2016
Legislative Date
2/16/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {569932/1
Proceedings
24
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2016
Legislative Date
2/16/2016
Action
Committee Amendment Adopted
Proceedings
24
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2016
Legislative Date
2/16/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Muse) {453724/1 Adopted
Proceedings
24
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2016
Legislative Date
2/16/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
24
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2016
Legislative Date
2/18/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
26
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2016
Legislative Date
2/19/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
28
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2016
Legislative Date
3/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/10/2016
Legislative Date
5/10/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 368
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/21/2016 1/22/2016 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/27/2016 1/27/2016 Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/15/2016 2/15/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/16/2016 2/16/2016 Favorable with Amendments {569932/1 24
Senate 2/16/2016 2/16/2016 Committee Amendment Adopted 24
Senate 2/16/2016 2/16/2016 Floor Amendment (Senator Muse) {453724/1 Adopted 24
Senate 2/16/2016 2/16/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 24
Senate 2/18/2016 2/18/2016 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 26
House 2/19/2016 2/19/2016 First Reading Ways and Means 28
House 3/10/2016 3/10/2016 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/05/2016 4/06/2016 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 4/06/2016 3/30/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 62
House 4/06/2016 3/30/2016 Second Reading Passed 62
House 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 64
Senate 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 5/10/2016 5/10/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 368
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-204, 10-204.7 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM