Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Anne Arundel County - Property Tax Credit for Business Entities - State of Emergency
Sponsored by
Senator Simonaire
Status
In the House - Rereferred to Ways and Means
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the governing body of Anne Arundel County to grant, by law, a tax credit against the county property tax imposed on real or personal property owned or leased by a business entity affected by a state of emergency declared under Title 14 of the Public Safety Article; authorizing the governing body of Anne Arundel County to provide for the amount and duration of the credit, the eligibility criteria, and the regulations and application process for the credit; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after June 30, 2021; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0662
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
8/13/2020
Legislative Date
8/13/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/22/2020
Legislative Date
12/22/2020
Action
Hearing 1/21 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2021
Legislative Date
3/25/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2021
Legislative Date
3/05/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2021
Legislative Date
3/05/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {943421/1 (Senator Simonaire) Adopted
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2021
Legislative Date
3/05/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2021
Legislative Date
3/06/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2021
Legislative Date
3/13/2021
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
32AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2021
Legislative Date
4/06/2021
Action
Rereferred to Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 8/13/2020 8/13/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 12/22/2020 12/22/2020 Hearing 1/21 at 11:00 a.m.
Text - First - Anne Arundel County - Property Tax Credit for Business Entities - State of Emergency
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/25/2021 3/25/2021 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/25/2021 3/05/2021 Favorable Adopted 32 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/25/2021 3/05/2021 Floor Amendment {943421/1 (Senator Simonaire) Adopted 32 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/25/2021 3/05/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 32 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Anne Arundel County - Property Tax Credit for Business Entities - State of Emergency
Senate 3/26/2021 3/06/2021 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 33 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2021 3/13/2021 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 32AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2021 4/06/2021 Rereferred to Ways and Means
Last Updated: 4/13/2021 1:14 PM
Click to return on the top page