Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Family Law - Protecting the Resources of Children in State Custody
Sponsored by
Senators Raskin, Benson, Brochin, Currie, Guzzone, Hough, Kelley, King, Lee, Madaleno, Manno, Muse, Ramirez, Ready, Rosapepe, Salling, Young, and Zirkin
Status
In the Senate - Recommitted to Judicial Proceedings (Senator Zirkin)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Human Resources to take specified actions when serving as a representative payee or fiduciary for specified federal benefits for a child in the Department's custody; requiring the Department to provide specified notice to the child, through the child's attorney, of specified actions taken with respect to specified benefits for the child; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0772
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0524 Session: 2015 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2016
Legislative Date
1/22/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/03/2016
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {238074/1
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Laid Over (Senator Serafini) Adopted
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/25/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {238074/1
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/25/2016
Action
Special Order until 4/01 (Senator Zirkin) Adopted
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {238074/1
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Special Order until 4/5 (Senator Zirkin) Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {238074/1
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Special Order until 4/7 (Senator Raskin) Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {238074/1
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Special Order until 4/11 (Senator Zirkin) Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {238074/1
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Special Order until later today (Senator Raskin) Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {238074/1
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Special Order until later today (Senator Raskin) Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {238074/1
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Recommitted to Judicial Proceedings (Senator Zirkin)
Proceedings
66
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/21/2016 1/22/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2016 2/03/2016 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/25/2016 3/28/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/28/2016 3/24/2016 Favorable with Amendments {238074/1 53
Senate 3/28/2016 3/24/2016 Laid Over (Senator Serafini) Adopted 53
Senate 3/29/2016 3/25/2016 Favorable with Amendments {238074/1 54
Senate 3/29/2016 3/25/2016 Special Order until 4/01 (Senator Zirkin) Adopted 54
Senate 4/01/2016 3/28/2016 Favorable with Amendments {238074/1 57
Senate 4/01/2016 3/28/2016 Special Order until 4/5 (Senator Zirkin) Adopted 57
Senate 4/05/2016 3/30/2016 Favorable with Amendments {238074/1 59
Senate 4/05/2016 3/30/2016 Special Order until 4/7 (Senator Raskin) Adopted 59
Senate 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Favorable with Amendments {238074/1 61
Senate 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Special Order until 4/11 (Senator Zirkin) Adopted 61
Senate 4/11/2016 4/03/2016 Favorable with Amendments {238074/1 64
Senate 4/11/2016 4/03/2016 Special Order until later today (Senator Raskin) Adopted 64
Senate 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 Favorable with Amendments {238074/1 65
Senate 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 Special Order until later today (Senator Raskin) Adopted 65
Senate 4/11/2016 4/06/2016 Favorable with Amendments {238074/1 66
Senate 4/11/2016 4/06/2016 Recommitted to Judicial Proceedings (Senator Zirkin) 66
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-527.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM