Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Corporations and Real Estate Investment Trusts - Miscellaneous
Sponsored by
Senators West and Waldstreicher
Status
In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Clarifying that the charter or bylaws of a corporation may require that any internal corporate claim be brought only in certain specified courts; repealing the authority of certain corporations to effect a certain reverse stock split; altering the manner in which a corporation may allow stockholders to participate in a certain meeting; authorizing a certain meeting of the stockholders to be held partially or solely by means of remote communication; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0781
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/30/2020
Legislative Date
10/30/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/28/2020
Legislative Date
12/28/2020
Action
Hearing 2/03 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Corporations and Real Estate Investment Trusts - Miscellaneous
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/02/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/02/2021
Action
Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/23/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/23/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Corporations and Real Estate Investment Trusts - Miscellaneous
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/24/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2021
Legislative Date
3/05/2021
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2021
Legislative Date
3/29/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2021
Legislative Date
3/14/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {873899/1 Adopted
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2021
Legislative Date
3/14/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2021
Legislative Date
3/15/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (125-10)
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/11/2021
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
38AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/11/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
38AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/11/2021
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Corporations and Real Estate Investment Trusts - Miscellaneous
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/30/2020 10/30/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 12/28/2020 12/28/2020 Hearing 2/03 at 11:00 a.m.
Text - First - Corporations and Real Estate Investment Trusts - Miscellaneous
Senate 2/02/2021 2/02/2021 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/02/2021 2/02/2021 Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/09/2021 3/09/2021 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/11/2021 2/23/2021 Favorable Adopted 24 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2021 2/23/2021 Second Reading Passed 24 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Corporations and Real Estate Investment Trusts - Miscellaneous
Senate 3/12/2021 2/24/2021 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 25 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2021 3/05/2021 Referred Economic Matters 24 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2021 3/29/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/30/2021 3/14/2021 Favorable with Amendments {873899/1 Adopted 33 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2021 3/14/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 33 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2021 3/15/2021 Third Reading Passed (125-10) 34 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2021 3/11/2021 Senate Concurs House Amendments 38AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2021 3/11/2021 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 38AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2021 3/11/2021 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Corporations and Real Estate Investment Trusts - Miscellaneous
Last Updated: 4/7/2021 11:58 AM
Click to return on the top page