Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax Subtraction Modification - Mortgage Forgiveness Debt Relief - Extension
Sponsored by
Senators Zucker, Peters, Eckardt, Edwards, Elfreth, Ferguson, Griffith, Guzzone, King, McCray, Rosapepe, Salling, and Serafini
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 303
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing the termination of a certain subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax for income from the discharge of indebtedness related to costs incurred with respect to a principal residence; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0380
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2019
Legislative Date
1/25/2019
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2019
Legislative Date
1/25/2019
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2019
Legislative Date
2/18/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2019
Legislative Date
2/19/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
29
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2019
Legislative Date
2/19/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
29
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2019
Legislative Date
2/21/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
31
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2019
Legislative Date
2/22/2019
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
33
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
4/03/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/30/2019
Legislative Date
4/30/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 303
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/25/2019 1/25/2019 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/25/2019 1/25/2019 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Income Tax Subtraction Modification - Mortgage Forgiveness Debt Relief - Extension
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/18/2019 2/18/2019 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/19/2019 2/19/2019 Favorable Adopted 29
Senate 2/19/2019 2/19/2019 Second Reading Passed 29
Text - Third - Income Tax Subtraction Modification - Mortgage Forgiveness Debt Relief - Extension
Senate 2/21/2019 2/21/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 31
House 2/22/2019 2/22/2019 Referred Ways and Means 33
House 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 4/03/2019 4/03/2019 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 4/03/2019 3/24/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 59
House 4/05/2019 3/29/2019 Third Reading Passed (131-0) 64
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Returned Passed 63
Post Passage 4/30/2019 4/30/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 303
Text - Chapter - Income Tax Subtraction Modification - Mortgage Forgiveness Debt Relief - Extension
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-207 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM