Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Environment - On-Site Sewage Disposal Systems - Best Available Technology for Nitrogen Removal
Sponsored by
Senators Conway, Pinsky, Astle, Currie, Feldman, Guzzone, Kagan, Madaleno, Nathan-Pulliam, Robinson, Young, and Zucker
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of the Environment to use specified money from the Bay Restoration Fund to assist a person in paying the cost difference between a conventional on-site sewage disposal system and a system utilizing nitrogen removal technology in a specified order of priority; requiring the Bay Cabinet, in consultation with the Chesapeake Bay Commission and other interested parties, to review specified matters; requiring the Bay Cabinet to report its findings to the Governor and General Assembly by December 31, 2017; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0281
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2017
Legislative Date
1/20/2017
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2017
Legislative Date
1/20/2017
Action
Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2017
Legislative Date
2/27/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2017
Legislative Date
2/28/2017
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2017
Legislative Date
2/28/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/2 (Senator Conway) Adopted
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2017
Legislative Date
3/02/2017
Action
Favorable Rejected (22-23)
Proceedings
35
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2017
Legislative Date
3/02/2017
Action
Motion Reconsider the favorable report (Senator Currie) Adopted
Proceedings
35
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2017
Legislative Date
3/02/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/3 (Senator Currie) Adopted
Proceedings
35
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/03/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
36
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/03/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {243926/1 (Senator Middleton) Rejected (20-26)
Proceedings
36
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/03/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {253621/1 (Senator Reilly)
Proceedings
36
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/03/2017
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted
Proceedings
36
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {253621/1 (Senator Reilly) Withdrawn
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/7 (Senator Conway) Adopted
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/8 (Senator Jennings) Adopted
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Middleton) Adopted
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Motion (Jennings) Reconsider Floor Amendment {243926/1 (Middleton) Adopted
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {243926/1 (Senator Middleton) Withdrawn
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/9 (Senator Middleton) Adopted
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2017
Legislative Date
3/09/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/14 (Senator Middleton) Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {703927/1 (Senator Middleton) Adopted
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {253122/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (27-18)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/20/2017 1/20/2017 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/20/2017 1/20/2017 Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Environment - On-Site Sewage Disposal Systems - Best Available Technology for Nitrogen Removal - Prohibition
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/27/2017 2/27/2017 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/28/2017 2/28/2017 Favorable 33
Senate 2/28/2017 2/28/2017 Motion Special Order until 3/2 (Senator Conway) Adopted 33
Senate 3/02/2017 3/02/2017 Favorable Rejected (22-23) 35
Senate 3/02/2017 3/02/2017 Motion Reconsider the favorable report (Senator Currie) Adopted 35
Senate 3/02/2017 3/02/2017 Motion Special Order until 3/3 (Senator Currie) Adopted 35
Senate 3/03/2017 3/03/2017 Favorable Adopted 36
Senate 3/03/2017 3/03/2017 Floor Amendment {243926/1 (Senator Middleton) Rejected (20-26) 36
Senate 3/03/2017 3/03/2017 Floor Amendment {253621/1 (Senator Reilly) 36
Senate 3/03/2017 3/03/2017 Motion Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted 36
Senate 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Floor Amendment {253621/1 (Senator Reilly) Withdrawn 37
Senate 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Motion Special Order until 3/7 (Senator Conway) Adopted 37
Senate 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Motion Special Order until 3/8 (Senator Jennings) Adopted 38
Senate 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Middleton) Adopted 39
Senate 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Motion (Jennings) Reconsider Floor Amendment {243926/1 (Middleton) Adopted 39
Senate 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Floor Amendment {243926/1 (Senator Middleton) Withdrawn 39
Senate 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Motion Special Order until 3/9 (Senator Middleton) Adopted 39
Senate 3/09/2017 3/09/2017 Motion Special Order until 3/14 (Senator Middleton) Adopted 40
Senate 3/14/2017 3/14/2017 Floor Amendment {703927/1 (Senator Middleton) Adopted 43
Senate 3/14/2017 3/14/2017 Floor Amendment {253122/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected 43
Senate 3/14/2017 3/14/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 43
Text - Third - Environment - On-Site Sewage Disposal Systems - Best Available Technology for Nitrogen Removal
Senate 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Third Reading Passed (27-18) 45
House 3/16/2017 3/13/2017 Referred Environment and Transportation 47
House 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-1108, 9-1605.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM