Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Task Force on Prohibiting Debris From Entering Storm Drains or Stormwater Inlets
Sponsored by
Senator Klausmeier
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Task Force on Prohibiting Debris From Entering Storm Drains or Stormwater Inlets; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Task Force; prohibiting a member of the Task Force from receiving certain compensation; requiring the Task Force, by November 1, 2019, to report its findings and to make recommendations to the General Assembly regarding the preventing plastic bottles and other debris from entering storm drains and stormwater inlets; etc.
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: HB0410
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2019
Legislative Date
1/25/2019
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/25/2019 1/25/2019 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Task Force on Prohibiting Debris From Entering Storm Drains or Stormwater Inlets
Senate 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM