Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Comprehensive Flood Management Grant Program – Awards for Flood Damage and Mandatory Funding
Sponsored by
Senators Hester, Guzzone, Carter, Hough, Kagan, Lam, Peters, West, and Zucker
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 652
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the policy and purpose of provisions of law governing flood control and watershed management to include establishing a grant program to assist local jurisdictions with infrastructure repairs, watershed restoration, and emergency protection work associated with a flood event; authorizing the Department of the Environment to use the comprehensive flood management grant program to award grants to subdivisions that incurred infrastructure damage of at least $1,000,000 caused by a flood event on or after January 1, 2009; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0428
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2019
Legislative Date
1/28/2019
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2019
Legislative Date
1/29/2019
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2019
Legislative Date
2/05/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2019
Legislative Date
2/05/2019
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {659230/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2019
Legislative Date
3/17/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Rereferred to Environment and Transportation and Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
4/04/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {840518/1 Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (107-27)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments
Proceedings
62A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
62A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Peters, Griffith and Eckardt)
Proceedings
62A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Peters, Griffith and Eckardt)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
House Refuses Recede
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Lafferty, Cassilly and Gaines)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
House Refuses Recede
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Lafferty, Cassilly and Gaines)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Conference Committee Report {683920/1 Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Conference Committee Report {683920/1 Adopted
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (107-24)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2019
Legislative Date
5/25/2019
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 652
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/28/2019 1/28/2019 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Comprehensive Flood Management Grant Program - Awards for Flood Damage and Mandatory Funding
Senate 1/29/2019 1/29/2019 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/05/2019 2/05/2019 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/05/2019 2/05/2019 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/18/2019 3/18/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/18/2019 3/16/2019 Favorable with Amendments {659230/1 Adopted 48
Senate 3/18/2019 3/16/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
Text - Third - Comprehensive Flood Management Grant Program – Awards for Flood Damage and Funding
Senate 3/19/2019 3/17/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 49
House 3/20/2019 3/16/2019 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 51
House 3/26/2019 3/27/2019 Rereferred to Environment and Transportation and Appropriations
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 4/04/2019 4/04/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/04/2019 3/26/2019 Favorable with Amendments {840518/1 Adopted 61
House 4/04/2019 3/26/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61
House 4/04/2019 3/27/2019 Third Reading Passed (107-27) 62
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments 62A
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Senate Requests House Recede 62A
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Peters, Griffith and Eckardt) 62A
House 4/06/2019 3/30/2019 Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments 65
House 4/06/2019 3/30/2019 Senate Requests House Recede 65
House 4/06/2019 3/30/2019 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Peters, Griffith and Eckardt) 65
House 4/06/2019 3/30/2019 House Refuses Recede 65
House 4/06/2019 3/30/2019 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Lafferty, Cassilly and Gaines) 65
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 House Refuses Recede 63
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Lafferty, Cassilly and Gaines) 63
Senate 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Conference Committee Report {683920/1 Adopted 64
Senate 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 64
House 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Conference Committee Report {683920/1 Adopted 67
House 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Third Reading Passed (107-24) 67
Senate 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Comprehensive Flood Management Grant Program – Awards for Flood Damage and Mandatory Funding
Post Passage 5/25/2019 5/25/2019 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 652
Text - Chapter - Comprehensive Flood Management Grant Program – Awards for Flood Damage and Mandatory Funding
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-801, 5-802, 5-803 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM