Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Property Tax Exemption - Disabled Active Duty Service Members, Disabled Veterans, and Surviving Spouses - Refund
Sponsored by
Senator Ellis
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State, a county, or a municipal corporation to pay a certain refund to a disabled active duty service member, disabled veteran, or surviving spouse under certain circumstances; requiring the State, a county, or a municipal corporation to pay interest on the refund under certain circumstances; and applying the Act to taxable years beginning after June 30, 2018.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1311
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0109 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2021
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
11/01/2020
Legislative Date
11/01/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/22/2020
Legislative Date
12/22/2020
Action
Hearing 1/20 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2021
Legislative Date
1/12/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2021
Legislative Date
1/12/2021
Action
Hearing 1/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/18/2021
Legislative Date
1/18/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/18/2021
Legislative Date
1/18/2021
Action
Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 11/01/2020 11/01/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 12/22/2020 12/22/2020 Hearing 1/20 at 11:00 a.m.
Text - First - Property Tax Exemption - Disabled Active Duty Service Members, Disabled Veterans, and Surviving Spouses - Refund
Senate 1/12/2021 1/12/2021 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/12/2021 1/12/2021 Hearing 1/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/18/2021 1/18/2021 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/18/2021 1/18/2021 Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 2/25/2021 2:38 PM
Click to return on the top page