Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Law – Voting Systems – Accessibility for Voters With Disabilities
Sponsored by
Senator Lam
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 11:00 a.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring each voter to use a ballot marking device that is accessible to voters with disabilities to vote at early voting centers and election day polling places to ensure that access is provided to voters with disabilities in accordance with a certain provision of law; applying the Act to all elections beginning with the statewide primary election held under a certain provision of law in 2022; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0423
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0757 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
7/10/2020
Legislative Date
7/10/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/02/2021
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 7/10/2020 7/10/2020 Pre-filed
Text - First - Election Law – Voting Systems – Accessibility for Voters With Disabilities
Senate 2/02/2021 2/02/2021 Hearing 2/18 at 11:00 a.m.
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/22/2021 2:47 PM
Click to return on the top page