Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Correctional Facilities - Correctional Officers - Background Check
Sponsored by
Senators Carozza, Eckardt, Edwards, and Serafini
Status
In the Senate - Recommitted to Finance (Senator Kelley)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering a certain provision of law to require the Secretary of Public Safety and Correctional Services to require an individual to pass a polygraph examination or extensive background check, or both, rather than just a polygraph examination, before being appointed to serve as a correctional officer in a correctional facility; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0012
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2019
Legislative Date
1/28/2019
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2019
Legislative Date
2/21/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2019
Legislative Date
2/22/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2019
Legislative Date
2/22/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2019
Legislative Date
2/26/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until 2/27 (Senator Carter) Adopted
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2019
Legislative Date
2/28/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/6 (Senator Jennings) Adopted
Proceedings
36
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/06/2019
Action
Motion Returned Second Reading (Senator Hershey) Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/06/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {233420/1 (Senator Carozza)
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/06/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/7 (Senator Peters) Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {233420/1 (Senator Carozza)
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/8 (Senator Edwards) Adopted
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {233420/1 (Senator Carozza) Withdrawn
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Substitute Floor Amendment {553329/1 (Senator Peters)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Peters) Adopted
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {553329/1 (Senator Peters)
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Motion Recommit to Committee (Senator Kelley) Adopted
Proceedings
43
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/28/2019 1/28/2019 First Reading Finance
Text - First - State Correctional Facilities - Correctional Officers - Background Check
Senate 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 2/21/2019 2/21/2019 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 2/22/2019 2/22/2019 Favorable Adopted 32
Senate 2/22/2019 2/22/2019 Second Reading Passed 32
Text - Third - State Correctional Facilities - Correctional Officers - Background Check
Senate 2/26/2019 2/26/2019 Motion Special Order until 2/27 (Senator Carter) Adopted 34
Senate 2/28/2019 2/28/2019 Motion Special Order until 3/6 (Senator Jennings) Adopted 36
Senate 3/06/2019 3/06/2019 Motion Returned Second Reading (Senator Hershey) Adopted 40
Senate 3/06/2019 3/06/2019 Floor Amendment {233420/1 (Senator Carozza) 40
Senate 3/06/2019 3/06/2019 Motion Special Order until 3/7 (Senator Peters) Adopted 40
Senate 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Floor Amendment {233420/1 (Senator Carozza) 41
Senate 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Motion Special Order until 3/8 (Senator Edwards) Adopted 41
Senate 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Floor Amendment {233420/1 (Senator Carozza) Withdrawn 42
Senate 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Substitute Floor Amendment {553329/1 (Senator Peters) 42
Senate 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Motion Laid Over (Senator Peters) Adopted 42
Senate 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Floor Amendment {553329/1 (Senator Peters) 43
Senate 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Motion Recommit to Committee (Senator Kelley) Adopted 43
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM