Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Promoter's Permit
Sponsored by
Senators Young and Hough
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 611
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Repealing in Frederick County a certain requirement for a promoter's permit, so that an event that a for-profit organization seeks to publicize, sell tickets for, organize, produce, or stage need not be conducted in conjunction with a nonprofit organization that holds a certain license; and providing permit fees of $50 if fewer than 500 people are expected to attend, $250 if 500 to 1,000 people will attend, $600 if 1,001 to 3,000 persons are expected to attend, and $1,000 for over 3,000 attendees.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0287
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2019
Legislative Date
1/28/2019
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Promoter's Permit
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2019
Legislative Date
1/29/2019
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/05/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/06/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {814635/1 Adopted
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/06/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Promoter's Permit
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-1)
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
43AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
4/03/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (128-0)
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2019
Legislative Date
5/25/2019
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 611
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Promoter's Permit
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/28/2019 1/28/2019 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Promoter's Permit
Senate 1/29/2019 1/29/2019 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/06/2019 3/06/2019 Favorable with Amendments {814635/1 Adopted 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/06/2019 3/06/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Promoter's Permit
Senate 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-1) 42 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/11/2019 3/08/2019 Referred Economic Matters 43AClick to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2019 4/03/2019 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/03/2019 3/24/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 59 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2019 3/27/2019 Third Reading Passed (128-0) 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Returned Passed 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/25/2019 5/25/2019 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 611
Text - Chapter - Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Promoter's Permit
(   20-102, 20-1103 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM
Click to return on the top page