Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Metro/Transit Funding Act
Sponsored by
Senators Feldman, Benson, Currie, Guzzone, Kagan, King, Lee, Madaleno, Manno, Middleton, Muse, Peters, Pinsky, Ramirez, Rosapepe, Smith, Young, and Zucker
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 351
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Secretary of Transportation to withhold a portion of the State's annual operating grant to the Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority under certain circumstances; requiring the Department of Transportation to provide an annual grant of at least $167,000,000 to pay capital costs of the Authority; requiring the Maryland Transit Administration to prepare a Central Maryland Regional Transit Plan in consultation with certain entities; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0372
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Contingency - on federal, state, or local action
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2018
Legislative Date
1/22/2018
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland Metro Funding Act
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2018
Legislative Date
1/24/2018
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {179435/1 Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Maryland Metro/Transit Funding Act
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/24/2018
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Rereferred to Appropriations and Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 2:30 p.m. (Appropriations)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
4/07/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {374966/1 Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (97-42)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Maryland Metro/Transit Funding Act
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/25/2018
Legislative Date
4/25/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 351
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Maryland Metro/Transit Funding Act
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/22/2018 1/22/2018 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Maryland Metro Funding Act
Senate 1/24/2018 1/24/2018 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/29/2018 3/29/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/29/2018 3/26/2018 Favorable with Amendments {179435/1 Adopted 57
Senate 3/29/2018 3/26/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 57
Text - Third - Maryland Metro/Transit Funding Act
Senate 3/30/2018 3/27/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 58
House 4/02/2018 3/24/2018 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 58
House 4/04/2018 4/05/2018 Rereferred to Appropriations and Environment and Transportation
House 4/05/2018 4/05/2018 Hearing 4/05 at 2:30 p.m. (Appropriations)
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 4/07/2018 4/07/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 4/07/2018 3/30/2018 Favorable with Amendments {374966/1 Adopted 64
House 4/07/2018 3/30/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 64
House 4/09/2018 4/01/2018 Third Reading Passed (97-42) 66
Senate 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Senate Concurs House Amendments 65
Senate 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 65
Senate 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Maryland Metro/Transit Funding Act
Post Passage 4/25/2018 4/25/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 351
Text - Chapter - Maryland Metro/Transit Funding Act
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-205, 3-216, 7-205, 7-301.1, 7-309 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM