Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Farms and Families Act
Sponsored by
Senators Middleton, Benson, Guzzone, Mathias, Peters, Reilly, and Smith
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 396
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Attorney General's Review Letter
Synopsis
Establishing the Maryland Farms and Families Program in the Department of Agriculture; establishing that the purpose of the Program is to double the purchasing power of food-insecure Maryland residents with limited access to fresh fruits and vegetables and to increase revenue for farmers through redemption of specified benefits at Maryland farmers markets; establishing a Maryland Farms and Families Fund; requiring the Governor to include a $500,000 appropriation to the Fund each fiscal year subject to the limitations of the State budget; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0586
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2017
Legislative Date
1/20/2017
Action
First Reading Finance and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland Farms and Families Act
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2017
Legislative Date
1/25/2017
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2017
Legislative Date
2/28/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {767877/1 Adopted
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Maryland Farms and Families Act
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/03/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
39
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/04/2017
Legislative Date
5/04/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 396
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Maryland Farms and Families Act
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/20/2017 1/20/2017 First Reading Finance and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Maryland Farms and Families Act
Senate 1/25/2017 1/25/2017 Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/28/2017 2/28/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/01/2017 3/01/2017 Favorable with Amendments {767877/1 Adopted 34
Senate 3/01/2017 3/01/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 34
Text - Third - Maryland Farms and Families Act
Senate 3/03/2017 3/03/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 36
House 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Referred Appropriations 39
House 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 3/31/2017 3/31/2017 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 61
House 4/04/2017 3/28/2017 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 62
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Returned Passed 59
Post Passage 5/04/2017 5/04/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 396
Text - Chapter - Maryland Farms and Families Act
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-2001 through 10-2005 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM