Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Department of Education and Maryland Department of Health - Maryland School-Based Health Center Standards - Telehealth
Sponsored by
Senator Kagan
Status
In the House - First Reading Health and Government Operations and Ways and Means
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State Department of Education and the Maryland Department of Health to authorize a certain health care practitioner at an approved school-based health center to provide health care services through telehealth under certain circumstances; prohibiting the State Department of Education and the Maryland Department of Health from establishing certain requirements for a certain school-based health center to provide health care services through telehealth; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: HB0034
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/08/2020
Legislative Date
10/08/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/29/2020
Legislative Date
12/29/2020
Action
Hearing 1/20 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/06/2021
Legislative Date
1/06/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/06/2021
Legislative Date
1/06/2021
Action
Hearing 1/20 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/09/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/09/2021
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
9 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/09/2021
Action
Motion Special Order until 2/10 (Senator Gallion) Adopted
Proceedings
9 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
10 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Motion Special Order until 2/12 (Senator Gallion) Adopted
Proceedings
10 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
12 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {523820/1 (Senator Simonaire)
Proceedings
12 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Simonaire) Adopted
Proceedings
12 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2021
Legislative Date
2/12/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {523820/1 (Senator Simonaire) Withdrawn
Proceedings
13 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2021
Legislative Date
2/12/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
13 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2021
Legislative Date
2/13/2021
Action
Motion Special Order until 2/22 (Senator Simonaire) Adopted
Proceedings
14 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2021
Legislative Date
2/14/2021
Action
Motion Special Order until 2/24 (Senator King) Adopted
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2021
Legislative Date
2/15/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (31-14)
Proceedings
16 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2021
Legislative Date
2/25/2021
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations Ways and Means
Proceedings
16 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 10/08/2020 10/08/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 12/29/2020 12/29/2020 Hearing 1/20 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 1/06/2021 1/06/2021 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/06/2021 1/06/2021 Hearing 1/20 at 3:00 p.m.
Text - First - State Department of Education and Maryland Department of Health - Maryland School-Based Health Center Standards - Telehealth
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/09/2021 2/09/2021 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/09/2021 2/09/2021 Favorable 9 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/09/2021 2/09/2021 Motion Special Order until 2/10 (Senator Gallion) Adopted 9 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/10/2021 2/10/2021 Favorable 10 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/10/2021 2/10/2021 Motion Special Order until 2/12 (Senator Gallion) Adopted 10 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/16/2021 2/11/2021 Favorable Adopted 12 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/16/2021 2/11/2021 Floor Amendment {523820/1 (Senator Simonaire) 12 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/16/2021 2/11/2021 Motion Laid Over (Senator Simonaire) Adopted 12 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/17/2021 2/12/2021 Floor Amendment {523820/1 (Senator Simonaire) Withdrawn 13 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/17/2021 2/12/2021 Second Reading Passed 13 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Department of Education and Maryland Department of Health - Maryland School-Based Health Center Standards - Telehealth
Senate 2/19/2021 2/13/2021 Motion Special Order until 2/22 (Senator Simonaire) Adopted 14 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/23/2021 2/14/2021 Motion Special Order until 2/24 (Senator King) Adopted 15 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/24/2021 2/15/2021 Third Reading Passed (31-14) 16 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/25/2021 2/25/2021 Referred Health and Government Operations Ways and Means 16 Click to view Recorded Media
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/25/2021 1:42 PM
Click to return on the top page