Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Metro Board Member Act
Sponsored by
Senator Feldman
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 354
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the requirement that Washington Suburban Transit Commission members appointed by the Governor serve as the Commission's appointees to be principal members of the Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority Board of Directors; encouraging each signatory of the Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority Compact to support reform of the Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority's governance structure to improve the efficiency, accountability, and effectiveness of the Authority's functions; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0370
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2018
Legislative Date
1/22/2018
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Metro Board Member Act
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2018
Legislative Date
1/24/2018
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {427878/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Metro Board Member Act
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (126-13)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/25/2018
Legislative Date
4/25/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 354
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Metro Board Member Act
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/22/2018 1/22/2018 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Metro Board Member Act
Senate 1/24/2018 1/24/2018 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/13/2018 3/13/2018 Favorable with Amendments {427878/1 Adopted 45
Senate 3/13/2018 3/13/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45
Text - Third - Metro Board Member Act
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 47
House 3/15/2018 3/12/2018 Referred Environment and Transportation 46
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 4/05/2018 4/05/2018 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 61A
House 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Third Reading Passed (126-13) 67
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Returned Passed 66
Post Passage 4/25/2018 4/25/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 354
Text - Chapter - Metro Board Member Act
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   87-1, 87-5, 87-7 )
(   III-1, III-5, III-7 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM