Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority – Metro Transit Police – Quotas and Police Complaints Board
Sponsored by
Senator Feldman
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 11:00 a.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority Compact to require the Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority to prohibit the use of enforcement quotas to evaluate, incentivize, or discipline members of the Metro Transit Police, including with regard to the number of arrests made or citations or warnings issued; and providing for the establishment, composition, powers, and duties of a Police Complaints Board, subject to a certain concurrence in the Act by the District of Columbia and the Commonwealth of Virginia.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0666
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Contingency - on adoption of an interstate compact
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/28/2020
Legislative Date
10/28/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/23/2020
Legislative Date
12/23/2020
Action
Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2021
Legislative Date
1/15/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2021
Legislative Date
1/31/2021
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2021
Legislative Date
2/04/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/28/2020 10/28/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Finance
Senate 12/23/2020 12/23/2020 Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority – Metro Transit Police – Quotas and Police Complaints Board
Senate 1/15/2021 1/15/2021 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/31/2021 1/31/2021 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/04/2021 2/04/2021 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/04/2021 2/05/2021 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 Hearing 2/25 at 11:00 a.m.
Last Updated: 2/28/2021 4:10 PM
Click to return on the top page