Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Arts Capital Grant Program
Sponsored by
Senators Elfreth, Augustine, Beidle, Griffith, Kagan, Lee, Waldstreicher, Washington, Guzzone, Rosapepe, Eckardt, Edwards, King, Peters, Salling, Serafini, and Zucker
Status
In the House - First Reading Appropriations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Maryland Arts Capital Grant Program to provide grants for the expansion of, the renovation of, or major repairs to a facility operated by a certain eligible organization; requiring the Governor, for fiscal years 2022 through 2027, to include $3,000,000 for the Program in the State budget; requiring the establishment of a competitive application process and a quantitative system to evaluate each application; prohibiting an organization from receiving a grant for a single project that exceeds $1,000,000 in any fiscal year; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Appropriations
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0127
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2020
Legislative Date
1/21/2020
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland Arts and Culture Capital Grant Program
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2020
Legislative Date
1/21/2020
Action
Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/04/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {899635/1 Adopted
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/04/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Maryland Arts Capital Grant Program
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
46
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/21/2020 1/21/2020 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Maryland Arts and Culture Capital Grant Program
Senate 1/21/2020 1/21/2020 Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/09/2020 3/09/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/09/2020 3/04/2020 Favorable with Amendments {899635/1 Adopted 43
Senate 3/09/2020 3/04/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 43
Text - Third - Maryland Arts Capital Grant Program
Senate 3/11/2020 3/06/2020 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 45
House 3/12/2020 3/09/2020 Referred Appropriations 46
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:58 PM