Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
City of Annapolis - Housing Authority - Prohibitions Against Exceptions to Local Laws
Sponsored by
Senators Elfreth, Beidle, and Rosapepe
Status
In the Senate - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a State public body from making an exception for the Housing Authority of the City of Annapolis to a law, rule, regulation, or ordinance that operates in Annapolis and relates to licensure or the inspection of real property, subject to certain exceptions; and applying the Act prospectively.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0544
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2020
Legislative Date
1/22/2020
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2020
Legislative Date
1/23/2020
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2020
Legislative Date
3/03/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2020
Legislative Date
3/01/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {274037/1 Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2020
Legislative Date
3/01/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2020
Legislative Date
3/03/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2020
Legislative Date
3/05/2020
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
42A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
49A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53C
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/22/2020 1/22/2020 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - City of Annapolis - Housing Authority - Prohibitions Against Exceptions to Local Laws
Senate 1/23/2020 1/23/2020 Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/03/2020 3/03/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/04/2020 3/01/2020 Favorable with Amendments {274037/1 Adopted 40
Senate 3/04/2020 3/01/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40
Text - Third - City of Annapolis - Housing Authority - Prohibitions Against Exceptions to Local Laws
Senate 3/06/2020 3/03/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 42
House 3/06/2020 3/05/2020 Referred Environment and Transportation 42A
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 49A
House 3/17/2020 3/14/2020 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 51A
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Returned Passed 53C
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/23/2020 8:36 AM