Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Frederick County - Ethics and Campaign Activity - Governing Body, County Board and Commission Members, and Board of License Commissioners
Sponsored by
Senators Hough and Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 272
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting an agent of a certain applicant from making a contribution to a member of the governing body of Frederick County during the pendency of a certain application; requiring certain members of the Frederick County Board of Zoning Appeals, Ethics Commission, or Planning Commission or the Board of License Commissioners for Frederick County who establish an authorized candidate campaign committee to vacate office no more than 48 hours after opening a campaign account through a campaign finance entity; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0630
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2018
Legislative Date
1/22/2018
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2018
Legislative Date
1/24/2018
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2018
Legislative Date
2/13/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
25
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2018
Legislative Date
2/13/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
25
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2018
Legislative Date
2/15/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
27
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2018
Legislative Date
2/16/2018
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
28
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/06/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/24/2018
Legislative Date
4/24/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 272
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/22/2018 1/22/2018 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Frederick County - Ethics and Campaign Activity - Governing Body, County Board and Commission Members, and Board of License Commissioners
Senate 1/24/2018 1/24/2018 Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/13/2018 2/13/2018 Favorable Adopted 25
Senate 2/13/2018 2/13/2018 Second Reading Passed 25
Text - Third - Frederick County - Ethics and Campaign Activity - Governing Body, County Board and Commission Members, and Board of License Commissioners
Senate 2/15/2018 2/15/2018 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 27
House 2/16/2018 2/16/2018 Referred Environment and Transportation 28
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 4/06/2018 4/06/2018 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/09/2018 4/01/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 66
House 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 67
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Returned Passed 66
Post Passage 4/24/2018 4/24/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 272
Text - Chapter - Frederick County - Ethics and Campaign Activity - Governing Body, County Board and Commission Members, and Board of License Commissioners
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   20-201, 20-202 )
(   5-857, 5-858, 5-860, 5-862, 5-865, 5-866 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM