Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Property Tax Credit - Public Safety Officer - Definition
Sponsored by
Senators Bailey, Carozza, Cassilly, Ellis, Gallion, Guzzone, Salling, and Smith
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 239
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "public safety officer" to include certain volunteer emergency medical technicians for purposes of a certain property tax credit; and applying the Act to taxable years beginning after June 30, 2019.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0477
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2019
Legislative Date
1/29/2019
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Property Tax Credit - Public Safety Officer - Definition
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2019
Legislative Date
2/01/2019
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2019
Legislative Date
2/18/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2019
Legislative Date
2/19/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2019
Legislative Date
2/19/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Property Tax Credit - Public Safety Officer - Definition
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2019
Legislative Date
2/21/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
31 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2019
Legislative Date
2/22/2019
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/30/2019
Legislative Date
4/30/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 239
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Property Tax Credit - Public Safety Officer - Definition
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2019 1/29/2019 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Property Tax Credit - Public Safety Officer - Definition
Senate 2/01/2019 2/01/2019 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/18/2019 2/18/2019 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/19/2019 2/19/2019 Favorable Adopted 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/19/2019 2/19/2019 Second Reading Passed 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Property Tax Credit - Public Safety Officer - Definition
Senate 2/21/2019 2/21/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 31 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/22/2019 2/22/2019 Referred Ways and Means 33 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/28/2019 3/28/2019 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/28/2019 3/20/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 55 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2019 3/24/2019 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Returned Passed 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/30/2019 4/30/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 239
Text - Chapter - Property Tax Credit - Public Safety Officer - Definition
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM
Click to return on the top page