Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

SB0292


CH0545

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Tri-County Council for Western Maryland - Membership
Sponsored by
Senator Edwards
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 545
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that two mayors from each member county or their representatives are to be appointed to the Tri-County Council for Western Maryland by the commissioners from their respective member county rather than by certain chapters of the Maryland Municipal League.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2020
Legislative Date
1/22/2020
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2020
Legislative Date
1/22/2020
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Tri-County Council for Western Maryland - Membership
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2020
Legislative Date
2/17/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2020
Legislative Date
2/18/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
30
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2020
Legislative Date
2/18/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
30
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Tri-County Council for Western Maryland - Membership
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2020
Legislative Date
2/20/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
32
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2020
Legislative Date
2/21/2020
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
33
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/17/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
52A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-0)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53C
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 545
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/22/2020 1/22/2020 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/22/2020 1/22/2020 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Tri-County Council for Western Maryland - Membership
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 2/17/2020 2/17/2020 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 2/18/2020 2/18/2020 Favorable Adopted 30
Senate 2/18/2020 2/18/2020 Second Reading Passed 30
Text - Third - Tri-County Council for Western Maryland - Membership
Senate 2/20/2020 2/20/2020 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 32
House 2/21/2020 2/21/2020 Referred Environment and Transportation 33
House 3/11/2020 3/11/2020 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/17/2020 3/17/2020 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 52A
House 3/18/2020 3/16/2020 Third Reading Passed (131-0) 53
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Returned Passed 53C
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 545
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 5/11/2020 4:22 PM