Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Law – Campaign Finance – Protection of Contributor Information
Sponsored by
Senator Simonaire
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/23 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from using contributor information from any report or statement required under provisions of law governing campaign finance for commercial solicitation purposes; and prohibiting a person from publishing contributor information from any report or statement required under provisions of law governing campaign finance in newspapers, magazines, books, or other similar media or on a website for the purpose of facilitating commercial solicitation.
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0129 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
8/13/2020
Legislative Date
8/13/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/19/2021
Legislative Date
1/19/2021
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/12/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {754133/1 Adopted
Proceedings
12 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
12 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2021
Legislative Date
2/13/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
14 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2021
Legislative Date
2/19/2021
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
14 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/01/2021
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 8/13/2020 8/13/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Election Law – Campaign Finance – Protection of Contributor Information
Senate 1/19/2021 1/19/2021 Hearing 2/04 at 11:00 a.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/12/2021 2/12/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/16/2021 2/11/2021 Favorable with Amendments {754133/1 Adopted 12 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/16/2021 2/11/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 12 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Election Law – Campaign Finance – Protection of Contributor Information
Senate 2/19/2021 2/13/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 14 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/19/2021 2/19/2021 Referred Ways and Means 14 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/01/2021 3/01/2021 Hearing 3/23 at 1:30 p.m.
(   13-106 )
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 6:11 PM
Click to return on the top page