Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Tanning Devices - Use by Minors
Sponsored by
Senators Benson, Kagan, Lam, and Nathan-Pulliam
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 441
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Repealing the exemption authorizing a parent or legal guardian of certain minors to provide certain written consent for the minor to use a tanning device; requiring the Maryland Department of Health to make available to each tanning facility a notice to be conspicuously posted in the facility regarding use of the facility by minors, penalties for violations of the Act, and health risks associated with tanning; providing that the Act does not apply to the use of phototherapy devices by certain health care practitioners; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0124
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2019
Legislative Date
1/30/2019
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Tanning Devices - Use by Minors
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {957176/1
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Hough) Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {957176/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Tanning Devices - Use by Minors
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (28-19)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2019
Legislative Date
3/19/2019
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (100-38)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/13/2019
Legislative Date
5/13/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 441
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Tanning Devices - Use by Minors
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/30/2019 1/30/2019 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Tanning Devices - Use by Minors
Senate 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 Favorable with Amendments {957176/1 44
Senate 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 Motion Laid Over (Senator Hough) Adopted 44
Senate 3/13/2019 3/13/2019 Favorable with Amendments {957176/1 Adopted 45
Senate 3/13/2019 3/13/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45
Text - Third - Tanning Devices - Use by Minors
Senate 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Third Reading Passed (28-19) 47
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Referred Health and Government Operations 47
House 3/19/2019 3/19/2019 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 4/01/2019 4/01/2019 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/02/2019 3/23/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 58
House 4/03/2019 3/24/2019 Third Reading Passed (100-38) 59
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 5/13/2019 5/13/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 441
Text - Chapter - Tanning Devices - Use by Minors
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM